Estate of George D. Clayton et al v. U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Estate of George D. Clayton, Lori Clayton, Morgan Clayton and Taylor Clayton
Defendant: U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company, Heritage Life Insurance Holdings, LLC and ABC Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00623
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company. (Turner, Joshua)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company's Answer is due 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/12/2021. (jls)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company. (Turner, Joshua)
October 5, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
October 5, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company. (Turner, Joshua)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Trempealeau County, case number 2021CV000090. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2944752), filed by U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, along with copies of all process, pleadings and orders, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Turner, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of George D. Clayton et al v. U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of George D. Clayton
Represented By: Scott J Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Clayton
Represented By: Scott J Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Clayton
Represented By: Scott J Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Clayton
Represented By: Scott J Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Financial Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Nathaniel Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Life Insurance Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?