United States of America v. One 2018 Lexus GX
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2018 Lexus GX
Claimant: Latosha Catchings and We Are Resilient NFP
Case Number: 3:2021cv00632
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Government responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 Claim by Claimants Latosha Catchings, We Are Resilient NFP. (Moyers, Peter)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Affidavit of LaTosha Catchings & We Are Resilient NFP . (Moyers, Peter)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Claimants Latosha Catchings, We Are Resilient NFP. (Moyers, Peter)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter R. Moyers for Claimants Latosha Catchings, We Are Resilient NFP. (Moyers, Peter)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued. (voc)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/14/2021. (voc)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Luehring, Heidi)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Warrant) (Luehring, Heidi)
October 8, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
October 8, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Michael K. Haverley re #1 Complaint (Luehring, Heidi)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One 2018 Lexus GX., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luehring, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2018 Lexus GX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heidi Luehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2018 Lexus GX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Latosha Catchings
Represented By: Peter R. Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: We Are Resilient NFP
Represented By: Peter R. Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?