Kohnen, Pamela v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pamela K. Kohnen
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00660
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer due 12/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/8/2021. (voc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Herring, Jacqueline)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacqueline J. Herring for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by William Ernest Parsons for Plaintiff Pamela K. Kohnen. (Parsons, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Naomi Rachel Smith for Plaintiff Pamela K. Kohnen. (Smith, Naomi)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Lynn Kristine Lodahl re: Plaintiff Pamela K. Kohnen (Lodahl, Lynn)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Lodahl, Lynn)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Pamela K. Kohnen. (Lodahl, Lynn)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (kwf)
October 21, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
October 21, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2952931.), filed by Pamela K. Kohnen. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lodahl, Lynn) Modified on 10/21/2021. (kwf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohnen, Pamela v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela K. Kohnen
Represented By: Lynn Kristine Lodahl
Represented By: Naomi Rachel Swain
Represented By: William Ernest Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?