Nolty, Travis v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Travis A Nolty and Travis Nolty
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00712
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 1/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/20/2021. (voc)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, W.)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (von Schleicher, W.) Modified on 12/20/2021. (lak)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, W.)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021. (Parsons, William)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (voc)
November 12, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
November 12, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2963639.), filed by Travis A Nolty. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Parsons, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolty, Travis v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis A Nolty
Represented By: William Ernest Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Nolty
Represented By: William Ernest Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: W. Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?