Cooper, Demetrius v. Matti, Richard et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Cooper
Defendant: Richard Matti, Kaylene Betancourt, L. Nerison, Ryan Blount and L.T. Nerison
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2021cv00727
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, dkt. #19 , is GRANTED. The second amended complaint, dkt. #19 , is the operative pleading in this case. In accordance with plaintiff's instructions, the claims plaintiff previously alleged in Lawsuit No. 1 against defendant Richard Matti, as identified in this order, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to his filing those claims at a later date, so long as he complies with the statute of limitations. Plaintiff granted leave to proceed in case no. 21-cv-727-slc against Defendants L.T. Nerison, Kaylene Betancourt. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Ryan Blount. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/10/2022. (lam),(ps)
January 6, 2022 Filing 19 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (aom),(ps) Modified on 1/10/2022 (lam).
December 23, 2021 Filing 18 Response to #17 Order by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (aom),(ps)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that plaintiff Demetrius Cooper's motion to amend his complaint, dkt. #8 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's amended complaint, dkt. #15 , is the operative pleading in this case. Plaintiff may have until January 18, 2022 to identify for the court which numbered lawsuit identified above (Lawsuit 1 or 2) he wishes to proceed with under the case number assigned to this case. Plaintiff must pick one and only one of these lawsuits to proceed under case no. 21-cv-727-slc. Also by January 18, plaintiff is to tell the court whether he wishes to pursue his other lawsuit under a separate case number, or whether he will dismiss it voluntarily. If plaintiff chooses to dismiss his other lawsuit voluntarily, then he will not owe a filing fee and he will be permitted to refile the dismissed claims later, so long as he complies with the statute of limitations. If plaintiff chooses to pursue his other lawsuit under a separate case number, then he will owe a separate filing fee. Once plaintiff chooses which lawsuits he wants to pursue, I will screen the claims to determine whether they state a claim upon which relief may be granted. If plaintiff fails to respond to this order by January 18, then I will enter an order dismissing his claims without prejudice for his failure to prosecute them. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and renewed request to use his release account funds to pay for litigation costs, dkt. #16 , is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to preserve evidence, dkt. #7 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/16/2021. (lam),(ps)
December 8, 2021 Filing 16 Motion to Reconsider the Use of Release Account Funds for copies, witness fees and other costs filed by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper re #3 Motion for Use of Release Account the Cost of Litigation (aom),(ps) Modified on 12/8/2021 (jef).
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT (signed) by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (aom),(ps) Modified on 12/16/2021 (lam).
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 Signed Copy #7 Motion to Preserve Evidence by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (aom),(ps)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/2/2021. (jef),(ps)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by the Wisconsin Department of Justice on behalf of Defendants Kaylene Betancourt, Ryan Blount, Richard Matti, L.T. Nerison. (jef),(ps)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (jef),(ps)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff's complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/1/2021. (lam),(ps)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from clerk's office regarding dkts. #7 and #8 unsigned motions filed by plaintiff. (jef),(ps) Modified on 12/1/2021 (jef).
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint (unsigned) by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (jef),(ps) See dkt. #15 for signed copy of motion. Modified on 12/6/2021 (lam).
December 1, 2021 PLRA Screening. (lam),(ps)
November 29, 2021 Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 34690039813. (lam),(ps)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Preserve Evidence by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (aom),(ps) See dkt. #14 for signed copy of motion. Modified on 12/6/2021 (lam).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #3 Motion for Use of Release Account for Partial Filing Fee and the Cost of Litigation. Plaintiff is to pay the $402 Filing Fee by 12/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/17/2021. (aom),(ps)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff Regarding Trust Fund Account Statement. (aom),(ps)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Use of Release Account for Partial Filing Fee's and the Cost of Litigation by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (aom),(ps)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (aom),(ps)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Demetrius Cooper. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper, Demetrius v. Matti, Richard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Matti
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaylene Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Nerison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.T. Nerison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?