Hayes, Kareen v. Fleury, Laura et al
Plaintiff: Kareen Hayes
Defendant: Laura Elizabeth Fleury, Shorehaven Behavioral Health and Milwaukee Behavioral Health
Case Number: 3:2021cv00728
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 Warden PLRA Letter. (aom),(ps)
January 5, 2022 Partial Filing fee received : $ 280.35, receipt number 34690039981 (aom),(ps)
December 29, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from clerk's office regarding dkt. #8 , #9 letters from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) Re-sent dkt. #1 complaint and #10 letter to plaintiff at correct address, Jackson Correctional, on 1/7/2022 (jef).
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from plaintiff requesting to disregard previous requests, request for a copy of the complaint and for permission to add additional facts to the complaint. (jef),(ps) (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (jef).
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 Letter Requesting Extension of Time, to Add Defendants, and Copies by Plaintiff Kareen Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 280.35 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 1/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/10/2021. (aom),(ps)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Kareen Hayes (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 IPP Calculation, #3 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds. Plaintiff is granted an enlargement of time to submit Trust Fund Account Statement by 12/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/29/2021. (aom),(ps)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Kareen Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 12/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/17/2021. (aom),(ps)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kareen Hayes. (aom),(ps)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Kareen Hayes. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 WI State Statute 893.585, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes, Kareen v. Fleury, Laura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareen Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Elizabeth Fleury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorehaven Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?