Firozabad, Maryam et al v. Blinken, Antony et al
Plaintiff: Maryam Mohammadnia Firozabad and Mohsen Dehghanpour
Defendant: Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of State, Christopher A. Wray, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Gentry Smith and Bureau of Diplomatic Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00730
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss by Plaintiffs Mohsen Dehghanpour, Maryam Mohammadnia Firozabad. (Lotfi, Shabnam)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed by Defendants Antony Blinken, Bureau of Diplomatic Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Gentry Smith, U.S. Department of State, Christopher A. Wray. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts) (Lotfi, Shabnam)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of State, Christopher A. Wray, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Gentry Smith, Bureau of Diplomatic Security. (kwf)
November 19, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
November 19, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibits filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Notice of DV interview, #2 Exhibit B. LPR card, #3 Exhibit C. I-130 Receipt Notice, #4 Exhibit D. June July 2018 Visa Bulletin, #5 Exhibit E. I-130 Approval Notice, #6 Exhibit F. Immigrant Visa Interview Appt Confirmation, #7 Exhibit G. Notice of Administrative Processing, #8 Exhibit H. Emails between Plaintiffs and Embassy) (Lotfi, Shabnam) Modified on 11/18/2021. (lak)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2967329.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 To be refiled, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Blinken, #4 Summons US Dept of State, #5 Summons FBI, #6 Summons Wray, #7 Summons Bureau of Dip Security, #8 Summons Smith, #9 Summons US Attorney, #10 Summons Attorney General) (Lotfi, Shabnam) Modified on 11/18/2021. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firozabad, Maryam et al v. Blinken, Antony et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryam Mohammadnia Firozabad
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohsen Dehghanpour
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Diplomatic Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?