Purina Animal Nutrition LLC v. Haschen, Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Purina Animal Nutrition LLC
Defendant: Thomas L. Haschen and David E. Cohen
Case Number: 3:2021cv00733
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Purina Animal Nutrition LLC (Miesen, Jonathan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David E. Cohen and Thomas L. Haschen. (jls)
November 22, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
November 22, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Purina Animal Nutrition LLC. (Miesen, Jonathan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David E. Cohen, Thomas L. Haschen. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2967919.), filed by Purina Animal Nutrition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Credit Application and Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C - Summary of Unpaid Invoices, #4 Exhibit D - Unpaid Invoices, #5 Exhibit E - Summary of Late Charges, #6 Exhibit F - Letter to Defendants dated May 5, 2021, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Directed to Thomas L. Haschen, #9 Summons Directed to David E. Cohen) (Miesen, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purina Animal Nutrition LLC v. Haschen, Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purina Animal Nutrition LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Miesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Haschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?