Kidd, Robert v. Waupun Correctional Inst. Employee Associates
Plaintiff: Robert Pierre Kidd
Defendant: Waupun Correctional Inst. Employee Associates
Not Classified By Court: WCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2021cv00759
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 23 Copy of letter at dkt. #21 in case 21-cv-757 and dkt. #20 in case 21-cv-759 regarding filing fees dated January 12, 2022 from plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Notices of electronic filing, account statement, disbursement requests, previously filed letters dated 1/11/22 and 1/12/22) (jef),(ps)
January 19, 2022 Filing 22 Letter dated January 15, 2022 regarding initial partial payments and release account funds from plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Letters from financial office and warden, notice of deduction for filing fees, interview/information request, ) (jef),(ps) Modified attachment description on 1/19/2022 (jef).
January 14, 2022 Filing 21 Letter Requesting Order Regarding Filing Fees by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd. (aom),(ps)
January 14, 2022 Filing 20 Letter from Plaintiff Regarding Filing Fees. (aom),(ps)
January 12, 2022 Filing 19 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd (aom),(ps)
January 11, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from plaintiff requesting the $50.88 initial partial payments be moved from release account funds to plaintiff's regular account. (Attachments: #1 Dept. of Veteran's Affairs letter, Disbursement Requests, account statements, warden letters, electronic filing notices, orders, business office letter, interview/information requests) (jef),(ps)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd's complaint, Dkt. #1 , is DISMISSED for failure to comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 18 and 20. Plaintiff may have until January 31, 2022, to submit a new complaint that complies with Rules 18 and 20. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 01/10/2022. (aom),(ps)
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 Letter from plaintiff regarding initial partial filing fees and to use release account to pay $350 and $250. (jef),(ps)
January 7, 2022 Filing 15 Letter regarding mail and e-filing by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Wis. Department of Correction memos) (jef),(ps)
January 7, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from plaintiff requesting an order to use release account funds to pay the filing fees. (Attachments: #1 Disbursement requests) (jef),(ps)
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 Warden PLRA Letter. (kmd),(ps)
January 6, 2022 Partial Filing fee received: $50.88, receipt number 34690039989. (kmd),(ps)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from plaintiff regarding filing fee. (jef),(ps)
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 Letter regarding mail and requesting to add information to the case by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2021: #3 Acknowledgment of Rules memo, 12/22/21, #4 Consent to receive mail memo, 12/9/21) (jef).
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd's motion for use of release account funds to pay the entire filing fee in this case is DENIED. Plaintiff may have until January 18, 2022, to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $50.88. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/28/2021. (lam),(ps)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd (Attachments: #1 Copy of dkt. #7 IFP Order Assessing Initial Partial Filing Fee) (aom),(ps)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Extension to Pay Filing Fee/Use of Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd. (aom),(ps)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 50.88 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 12/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/09/2021. (aom),(ps)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 Copy of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd. (aom),(ps)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Copy of #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Wisconsin Watch Article Titled Wisconsin Joins National Push to Curb Solitary Confinement, UW Health Documents, Discharge Summary, and Other Miscellaneous Documents) (aom),(ps)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 12/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/30/2021. (aom),(ps)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Pierre Kidd. (aom),(ps)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Robert Pierre Kidd. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 WisconsinWacth Article Titled Wisconsin Joins National Push to Curb Solitary Confinement, UW Health Documents, Discharge Summary, and Other Miscellaneous Documents) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidd, Robert v. Waupun Correctional Inst. Employee Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pierre Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waupun Correctional Inst. Employee Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?