Grevich, Lauren v. Barclays Bank Delaware
Plaintiff: Lauren Grevich
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Case Number: 3:2021cv00777
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court having been advised by counsel that this action has been settled, this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Any party may move to dismiss with prejudice or to reopen for good cause shown. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/10/2022. (arw)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Lauren Grevich (Marco, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Barclays Bank Delaware. (arw)
December 10, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
December 10, 2021 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Larry P. Smith for Plaintiff Lauren Grevich. (Smith, Larry)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by David Michael Marco for Plaintiff Lauren Grevich. (Marco, David)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Barclays Bank Delaware ( Filing fee $402, receipt number 0758-2976661) filed by Lauren Grevich. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Marco, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grevich, Lauren v. Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Grevich
Represented By: Larry P. Smith
Represented By: David Michael Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?