Schlintz, Teresa v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Schlintz
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2021cv00779
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER denying as moot #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/4/2022. (kwf)
February 3, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, W.)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (von Schleicher, W.)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff Teresa M. Schlintz and defendants UnitedHealth Group Inc. and Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of UnitedHealth Group Inc, filed a stipulation to dismiss all claims against these defendants without prejudice. (Dkt. #10 .) The court will construe this filing as a motion to amend the complaint under Rule 15(a) and GRANT it. The case will proceed against defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. alone. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/6/2022. (kwf)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of UnitedHealth Group Inc., and Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of UnitedHealth Group Inc. by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (von Schleicher, W.)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 2/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/5/20222. (kwf)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, W.)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (von Schleicher, W.)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, W.)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Covington, Brianna)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Covington, Brianna)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Covington, Brianna)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (kwf)
December 10, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
December 10, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2976743.), filed by Teresa M. Schlintz. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Hartford, #3 Summons Summons UnitedHealth Group Inc, #4 Summons Summons Plan) (Covington, Brianna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlintz, Teresa v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Schlintz
Represented By: Brianna Marie Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: W. Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?