Daimler Trucks North America, LLC v. Boss Truck Shops, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Defendant: Boss Truck Shops, Inc. doing business as Bosselman Enterprises
Case Number: 3:2021cv00782
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry Twomey for Defendant Boss Truck Shops, Inc.. (Twomey, Henry)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion to Reschedule Hearing. The telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is rescheduled to February 15, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/14/2022. (voc)
January 14, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
January 13, 2022 Filing 7 Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference (currently set for 2/11/22@2:30) by Plaintiff Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Fertl, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Trevino for Plaintiff Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Trevino, Andrew)
January 6, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Boss Truck Shops, Inc.. (Behnke, Luke)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Boss Truck Shops, Inc.. (Behnke, Luke)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Boss Truck Shops, Inc. (voc)
December 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
December 13, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Fertl, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boss Truck Shops, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2977239.), filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Assignment of Claim, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Fertl, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/10/2021: Correctly add the d/b/a for the defendant. E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC v. Boss Truck Shops, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Fertl
Represented By: Andrew Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boss Truck Shops, Inc. doing business as Bosselman Enterprises
Represented By: Henry Twomey
Represented By: Luke Steven Behnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?