Quincy Bioscience, LLC v. Retail Hunter LLC et al
Plaintiff: Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Defendant: Retail Hunter LLC and Leila Seto
Case Number: 3:2021cv00787
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 13 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC (Karnik, Sanjay)
February 7, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2022 at 02:30 PM rescheduled to 2/18/2022 at 01:00 PM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak)
January 24, 2022 Filing 12 Answer to #11 Counterclaim by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC, Counter Defendant Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Karnik, Sanjay)
January 7, 2022 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Quincy Bioscience, LLC, by Retail Hunter LLC and Leila Seto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Business Solutions Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Intellectual Property Policy) (Cahen, Geoffrey) Modified on 1/3/2022. (lak)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion to Admit Geoffrey Cahen Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/30/2021. (lak)
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Geoffrey Cahen for Defendants Retail Hunter LLC, Leila Seto. (Cahen, Geoffrey)
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to Admit Geoffrey Cahen Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2985302.) by Defendants Retail Hunter LLC, Leila Seto. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Cahen, Geoffrey)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Leila Seto served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Karnik, Sanjay)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Retail Hunter LLC served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Karnik, Sanjay) Modified on 12/23/2021: Served 12/15/2021. (lak)
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Leila Seto, Retail Hunter LLC, Retail Hunter LLC via Registered Agent. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Retail Hunter LLC, #2 Summons - Retail Hunter LLC via Registered Agent) (arw)
December 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
December 13, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Karnik, Sanjay)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Karnik, Sanjay)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Karnik, Sanjay)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for False Advertising, Trademark Infringement, and Related Claims against All Defendants. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0758-2977719) filed by Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - PREVAGEN Trademark Registration, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Karnik, Sanjay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quincy Bioscience, LLC v. Retail Hunter LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Represented By: Sanjay Satish Karnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Hunter LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey Cahen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leila Seto
Represented By: Geoffrey Cahen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?