Gonzales, Telenna v. Hanger, Ernest
Plaintiff: Telenna Gonzales
Defendant: Ernest Hanger
Case Number: 3:2022cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Alison Leff for Plaintiff Telenna Gonzales. (Leff, Alison)
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ernest Hanger. (Jesser, Steven) Modified on 2/10/2022. (lak)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven H. Jesser for Defendant Ernest Hanger. (Jesser, Steven)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant Ernest Hanger. (Jesser, Steven)
January 30, 2022 Filing 4 Notice by Plaintiff Telenna Gonzales of Law Firm Name Change. (Kayes, Thomas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Ernest Hanger served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Kayes, Thomas)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ernest Hanger. (rks)
January 4, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
January 4, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ernest Hanger. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2986119.), filed by Telenna Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons on Ernest Hanger) (Kayes, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales, Telenna v. Hanger, Ernest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telenna Gonzales
Represented By: Thomas R. Kayes
Represented By: Alison Leff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Hanger
Represented By: Steven H. Jesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?