Soulier, Michael v. Bayfield County et al
Plaintiff: Michael DuWayne Soulier
Defendant: Bayfield County and Bayfield County Tribal Relations Committee
Case Number: 3:2022cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 Letter Requesting Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Michael DuWayne Soulier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/18/2022. (aom),(ps)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 Affidavit of Michael Soulier filed by Plaintiff Michael DuWayne Soulier re: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Letter from Laurie Butterfield Regarding Michael Soulier, #2 Copy of Dkt. #3 Order, #3 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff is to submit an Affidavit of Indigency by 1/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/03/2022. (aom),(ps)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael DuWayne Soulier. (aom),(ps)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Michael DuWayne Soulier. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Receipt of USPS First Class Mail dated 12-13-21, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soulier, Michael v. Bayfield County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DuWayne Soulier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayfield County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayfield County Tribal Relations Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?