Royal Credit Union v. Hartnell, Mildred et al
Plaintiff: Royal Credit Union
Defendant: Mildred L. Hartnell, Frederick W. Hartnelll, Ryan Thomas Bechard and Kathleen Lynn Bechard
Case Number: 3:2022cv00010
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER from USCA dismissing appeal for failure to timely pay the required docketing fee, pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b), as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan Thomas Bechard. No record to be returned. (Attachments: #1 Mandate) (kmd),(ps)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER from USCA denying the petition for a writ of mandamus. Appellant is warned that he may face sanctions if he continues to submit frivolous or repetitive filings in his appeals. (kmd),(ps)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER from USCA denying motion for injunctive relief. Appellant is warned that he may face sanctions if he continues to submit frivolous or repetitive filings in his appeals as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan Thomas Bechard. (jef),(ps)
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from the clerk's office regarding Notice of Appeal to the Supreme Court of the United States per 28 USC 3904 filed by Ryan Thomas Bechard. (jef),(ps)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 Certificate of Service by Defendant Ryan Thomas Bechard. (Bechard, Ryan),(ps)
January 25, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appeal to the Supreme Court of the United States by Defendant Ryan Thomas Bechard as to #4 Order, 10 Text Only Order. Appeal filed by USA. (Bechard, Ryan),(ps) Modified docket text to match title of document. (jef).
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Record by Buffalo County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Ryan Thomas Bechard's motion for reconsideration of my orders denying his requests to reopen case nos. 21-cv-811-jdp and 22-cv-10-jdp is DENIED. He is incorrect that the orders were issued by a magistrate judge, and his argument that my orders are invalid because they do not bear a court seal and are electronically signed is frivolous. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/11/2022. (kmd),(ps)
January 10, 2022 USCA Case Number 22-1030 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan Thomas Bechard. (kmd),(ps)
January 8, 2022 Filing 9 Emergency Motion for Reconsideration TO VACATE MAGISTRATE AND MAGISTRATE'S ORDER AND ACTIONS (Ex Parte Document) by Defendant Ryan Thomas Bechard. (Bechard, Ryan),(ps)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Order, dkt, #4 , #2 Docket sheet) (jef),(ps)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 Appeal Information Packet. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet) (jef),(ps)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Ryan Thomas Bechard as to #4 Order. Motion for ifp or $505 Appeal fee due. No Docketing Statement filed. (Bechard, Ryan),(ps) Modified docket text on 1/7/2022. (jef).
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Record sent to Circuit Court of Buffalo County. (jef),(ps)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Ryan Thomas Bechard's motion to reopen case nos. 21-cv-810-jdp and 21-cv-811-jdp, Dkt. 4 in the '810 case, is DENIED. Case no. 22-cv-10-jdp is REMANDED to state court. The sanctions against Bechard are modified as set forth in this opinion. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/7/2022. (kmd),(ps)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS by Defendant Ryan Thomas Bechard. (Bechard, Ryan),(ps)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Magistrate Judge by Defendant Ryan Thomas Bechard. (Bechard, Ryan),(ps)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF STATE CASE; 9 USC 205; from BUFFALO COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 21-CV-00010. ( $402 filing fee due), filed by Ryan Thomas Bechard. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bechard, Ryan),(ps) Modified on 1/7/2022 (jef).
January 6, 2022 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Credit Union v. Hartnell, Mildred et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Credit Union
Represented By: Christine Gimber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred L. Hartnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick W. Hartnelll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Thomas Bechard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Lynn Bechard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?