Germantown Mutual Insurance Company v. MJC America, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: MJC America, Ltd., Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd. and Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Case Number: 3:2022cv00026
Filed: January 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff has moved for leave to serve MJC America, Ltd. By publication, pursuant to F.Rs. civ. Pro. 4(h)(1)(A), 4[e](1), and Sect. 415.50 of the California Code of Civil Procedure. In the same motion, plaintiff seeks leave to serve early discovery on MJC America, Ltd. and Gree USA, Inc. in order to learn the current home and office address of MJC America, Ltd.'s registered agent. Plaintiff's submissions establish that the requirements of these rules and Section 415.50 have been met, and that there is good cause to allow the requested early discovery. See dkts. #10 - #12 and #12 -1 through #12 -5. Therefore, it is ORDERED that plaintiff's motion is GRANTED in all respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/15/2022. (rks)
March 15, 2022 Filing 14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Nester, Hillary)
March 14, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Hillary Annin Nester for Plaintiff Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Nester, Hillary)
March 10, 2022 Filing 12 Affidavit of Ronald W. Harmeyer filed by Plaintiff Germantown Mutual Insurance Company in Support of re: #10 Motion for Service by Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - California Secretary of State's website, #2 Exhibit B - Process Server Information Re Service upon MJC America, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Non-Service, #4 Exhibit D - Gree Entities' Answer in Travelers Home & Marine Ins. Co., v. Gree USA, Inc. et al., #5 Exhibit E - Communication with Attorney Robert Beckmann) (Harmeyer, Ronald)
March 10, 2022 Filing 11 Brief in Support of #10 Motion for Service by Publication and Leave to Serve Discovery by Plaintiff Germantown Mutual Insurance Company (Harmeyer, Ronald)
March 10, 2022 Filing 10 Motion for Service by Publication in Newspaper by Plaintiff Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Harmeyer, Ronald)
March 7, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. (Spoto, Marcella)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. Brief in Opposition due 3/25/2022. Brief in Reply due 4/4/2022. (Spoto, Marcella)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, extension granted. Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., and MJC America, Ltd. answer due 3/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/28/2022. (rks)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. (Spoto, Marcella) Modified on 2/28/2022. (lak)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Travis James Rhoades for Defendants Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. (Rhoades, Travis)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Marcella S. Spoto for Defendants Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. (Spoto, Marcella)
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Gree USA, Inc. served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (Harmeyer, Ronald)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MJC America, Ltd., et al. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Gree USA, Inc., #2 Summons Issued - Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., #3 Summons Issued - Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai) (rks)
January 19, 2022 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related case: 21-cv-236-jdp. (rks)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2994533.), filed by Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - MJC America, Ltd., #3 Summons - Gree USA, Inc., #4 Summons - Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., #5 Summons - Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai) (Harmeyer, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company v. MJC America, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Hillary Annin Nester
Represented By: Ronald W. Harmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America, Ltd.
Represented By: Marcella S. Spoto
Represented By: Travis James Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Represented By: Marcella S. Spoto
Represented By: Travis James Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd.
Represented By: Marcella S. Spoto
Represented By: Travis James Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Represented By: Marcella S. Spoto
Represented By: Travis James Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?