Carnes, Jill v. C & W Trucking Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jill Carnes
Defendant: C & W Trucking Co., Randy Erickson, Erie Insurance Exchange and American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00142
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant Randy Erickson. (Crooks, Michael)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued/Reissued as to All Defendants. (lak)
May 3, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jill Carnes. (Attachments: #1 Summons C & W Trucking Co., #2 Summons Randy Erickson, #3 Summons Erie Insurance Exchange, #4 Summons American Family Mutual Insurance Company) (Balmer, James) Modified on 5/4/2022. (lak)
April 27, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Balmer, James)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #7 Stipulation to Provide an Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, extension granted. Randy Erickson answer due 5/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/15/2022. (rks)
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 Stipulation to Provide an Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Defendant Randy Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brown, Andrew)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant C & W Trucking Co. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter dated 4-14-22) (Dickey, Todd)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and Retainer filed by Todd Charles Dickey for Defendant C & W Trucking Co.. (Dickey, Todd)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 Disregard. Modified on 4/14/2022. (lak)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Ryan Brown for Defendant Randy Erickson. (Brown, Andrew)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to C & W Trucking Co. and Randy Erickson. (lak)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3023308.), filed by Jill Carnes. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Balmer, James) Modified on 3/16/2022: Corrected county and cause of action. (lak)
March 16, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
March 16, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnes, Jill v. C & W Trucking Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Carnes
Represented By: James Walter Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & W Trucking Co.
Represented By: Todd Charles Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Erickson
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Brown
Represented By: Michael Patrick Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?