Snyder, Ericka v. Brotoloc Health Care Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ericka Snyder
Defendant: Brotoloc Health Care Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00180
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 6/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due 12/23/2022. Settlement Letters due 4/28/2023. Motions in Limine due 5/5/2023. Response to Motion due 5/19/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2023 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/5/2023 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/25/2022. (voc)
May 25, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/24/2022 [:10] (cak)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Dispositive motions in this case shall be briefed on a 30/15 response/reply cycle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/24/2022. (kwf)
May 24, 2022 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Witte, Douglas)
April 29, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Brotoloc Health Care Systems, Inc.. (Witte, Douglas)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER by Defendant Brotoloc Health Care Systems, Inc.. (Witte, Douglas)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brotoloc Health Care Systems, Inc. (lak)
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Ericka Snyder. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stanek, Jon)
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brotoloc Health Care Systems, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3030516.), filed by Ericka Snyder. (Stanek, Jon)
April 1, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
April 1, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder, Ericka v. Brotoloc Health Care Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Snyder
Represented By: Jon E. Stanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotoloc Health Care Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?