Grevich, Lauren v. Comenity Capital Bank
Plaintiff: Lauren Grevich
Defendant: Comenity Capital Bank
Case Number: 3:2022cv00181
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Comenity Capital Bank answer due 6/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/20/2022. (voc)
May 20, 2022 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Comenity Capital Bank. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Morrissey, James)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Comenity Capital Bank answer due 5/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/28/2022. (voc)
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Comenity Capital Bank. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Morrissey, James)
April 28, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Comenity Capital Bank. (Morrissey, James)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by James J. Morrissey for Defendant Comenity Capital Bank. (Morrissey, James)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Anna-Katrina S. Christakis for Defendant Comenity Capital Bank. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Comenity Capital Bank served on 4/7/2022, answer due 4/28/2022. (Marco, David)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Comenity Capital Bank. (lak)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Larry P. Smith for Plaintiff Lauren Grevich. (Smith, Larry)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by David Michael Marco for Plaintiff Lauren Grevich. (Marco, David)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Comenity Capital Bank. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3029813.), filed by Lauren Grevich. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Marco, David)
March 31, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
March 31, 2022 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related case: 21-cv-777-wmc. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grevich, Lauren v. Comenity Capital Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Grevich
Represented By: Larry P. Smith
Represented By: David Michael Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Capital Bank
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis
Represented By: James J. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?