Neff Group Distributors, Inc. v. Cognex Corporation
Plaintiff: Neff Group Distributors, Inc.
Defendant: Cognex Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00186
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At a May 18, 2022 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference, the court set a skeletal schedule: discovery is stayed until August 29, 2022 or until the court rules on the two pending dispositive motions (dkts. #7 & #10 ), whichever comes first. Jury selection and trial is set for November 6, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. If this court denies both pending motions, then we will hold a follow-up telephonic conference to set the interstitial dates and deadlines leading toward trial. The parties had no other matters to bring to the court's attention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/18/2022. (rks)
May 18, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/18/2022 [:10] (skv)
May 12, 2022 Filing 19 Brief in Reply by Defendant Cognex Corporation in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss (Patterson, Timothy)
May 12, 2022 Filing 18 Brief in Reply by Defendant Cognex Corporation in Support of #7 Motion to Transfer, (Patterson, Timothy)
May 2, 2022 Filing 17 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Neff Group Distributors, Inc. re: #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cognex Corporation (Juedes, Dieter)
May 2, 2022 Filing 16 Declaration of Dieter J. Juedes filed by Plaintiff Neff Group Distributors, Inc. re: #7 Motion to Transfer, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Cognex's 3-11-22 Letter) (Juedes, Dieter)
May 2, 2022 Filing 15 Declaration of Don Norman filed by Plaintiff Neff Group Distributors, Inc. re: #7 Motion to Transfer, (Juedes, Dieter)
May 2, 2022 Filing 14 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Neff Group Distributors, Inc. re: #7 Motion to Transfer, filed by Cognex Corporation (Juedes, Dieter)
April 28, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Potter for Plaintiff Neff Group Distributors, Inc.. (Potter, Rachel)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendant has filed an expedited motion to transfer that will be under advisal to the court on May 12, 2022. So that this case does not lose its place in line for trial in the event this court does not transfer it, the court will hold a telephonic scheduling conference on May 18, 2022 at 2:30 PM. Prior to this, the parties must meet and confer to discuss a schedule leading toward trial, but they need not submit a Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/19/2022. (rks)
April 19, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 Brief in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Cognex Corporation (Patterson, Timothy)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Cognex Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 5/2/2022. Brief in Reply due 5/12/2022. (Patterson, Timothy)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 Declaration of Timothy J. Patterson filed by Defendant Cognex Corporation re: #7 Expedited Motion to Transfer, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 11, 2022 Letter from T. Patterson to D. Juedes) (Patterson, Timothy) Modified on 4/12/2022. (lak)
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 Brief in Support of #7 Expedited Motion to Transfer by Defendant Cognex Corporation. (Patterson, Timothy) Modified on 4/12/2022. (lak)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 Expedited MOTION TO TRANSFER to U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts by Defendant Cognex Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 5/2/2022. Brief in Reply due 5/12/2022. (Patterson, Timothy) Modified on 4/12/2022. (lak)
April 11, 2022 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Neff Group Distributors, Inc.. (Nold, Blake)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Blake Andrew Nold for Plaintiff Neff Group Distributors, Inc.. (Nold, Blake)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Trent Johnson for Defendant Cognex Corporation. (Johnson, Trent)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Cognex Corporation. (Patterson, Timothy)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 Notice by Defendant Cognex Corporation re: #1 Notice of Removal. Civil Cover Sheet. (Patterson, Timothy)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Dane County, Wisconsin, case number 2022CV000460. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3030912), filed by Cognex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint and Exhibits) (Patterson, Timothy) Modified on 4/4/2022. (lak)
April 4, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
April 4, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neff Group Distributors, Inc. v. Cognex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neff Group Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Dieter John Juedes
Represented By: Blake Andrew Nold
Represented By: Rachel Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cognex Corporation
Represented By: Timothy John Patterson
Represented By: Trent Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?