Robertson, Robert v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Robert M. Robertson
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00192
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1362 ERISA
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, by Plaintiff Robert M. Robertson. (Victor, Jessa) Modified on 6/7/2022. (lak)
June 2, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanus, David)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/25/2022. (voc)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanus, David)
April 25, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 6/3/2022. (voc)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Parsons, William)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanus, David)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Keenan Ryan for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Ryan, Daniel)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David John Hanus for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanus, David)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (lak)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3035390.), filed by Robert M. Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parsons, William)
April 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 11, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson, Robert v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Robertson
Represented By: Brook E Tylka
Represented By: Jessa L. Victor
Represented By: William Ernest Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: David John Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?