Mosby, Willie v. Green Co. (WI) (a.d.a.) Laura Kohl et al
Plaintiff: Willie L Mosby
Defendant: Green Co. (WI) (a.d.a.) Laura Kohl, Green Co. (WI) District Attorney Office, Green Co. (WI) Jail Administration Personnel and Green Co. (WI) Sheriff Office - Respondents
Case Number: 3:2022cv00202
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps)
June 6, 2022 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 16.04, receipt number 34690040705. (jef),(ps)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 16.04 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/13/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 Letter from plaintiff regarding trust fund account statement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/11/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Willie L Mosby. (aom),(ps)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Willie L Mosby. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosby, Willie v. Green Co. (WI) (a.d.a.) Laura Kohl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie L Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Co. (WI) (a.d.a.) Laura Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Co. (WI) District Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Co. (WI) Jail Administration Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Co. (WI) Sheriff Office - Respondents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?