Linman, Scott v. Marten Transport, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Scott Linman
Defendant: Marten Transport Ltd. and Marten Transport, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00204
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERIT IS ORDERED that defendant Marten Transport's motion to dismiss, Dkt #13 , is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff Scott Linman's claims for injunctive relief, breach of contract, unjust enrichment, invasion of privacy, and breach of confidence are DISMISSED. The motion is denied as to Linman's negligence claim. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/17/2023. (voc)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' #20 joint request to hold in abeyance the front-end 21-day deadline set in the Standing Order governing ESI is GRANTED. The clock starts to run when the discovery stay is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/2/2022. (rks)
August 1, 2022 Filing 20 Joint Motion for Clarification re #19 Standing Order on Discovery of Electronically Stored Information with Discovery Stay and Pending Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Scott Linman. (Berry, M. Anderson)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Standing Order Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information in a Complex Civil Lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/11/2022. (jls)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23 due 4/14/2023. Dispositive Motions due 10/27/2023. Settlement Letters due 3/15/2024. Motions in Limine due 3/22/2024. Response to Motion due 4/5/2024. First Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2024 at 04:00 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2024 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/29/2024 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/11/2022. (jls)
July 8, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/8/2022 [:15] (skv)
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant Marten Transport, Ltd. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 Brief in Reply by Defendant Marten Transport, Ltd. in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss (O'Donnell, Jordan)
June 22, 2022 Filing 15 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Scott Linman re: #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Marten Transport, Ltd. (Prosser, Nathan)
June 7, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2022 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
June 1, 2022 Filing 14 Brief in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendant Marten Transport, Ltd. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
June 1, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendant Marten Transport, Ltd.. Brief in Opposition due 6/22/2022. Brief in Reply due 7/5/2022. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit Terence Coates Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/26/2022. (lak)
May 25, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to Admit Terence Coates Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3064101.) by Plaintiff Scott Linman. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Coates, Terence)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time, extension granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/3/2022. (rks)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Marten Transport, Ltd.. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 Stipulation to Extend Time by Defendant Marten Transport, Ltd. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Jordan O'Donnell for Defendant Marten Transport, Ltd. (O'Donnell, Jordan) Modified on 5/3/2022: Counsel's user account updated? E-mail sent. (lak)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Nathan D. Prosser Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Admit M. Anderson Berry Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/21/2022. (lak)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to Admit M. Anderson Berry Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-3040009.) by Plaintiff Scott Linman. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Berry, M. Anderson)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Nathan D. Prosser Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-3039823.) by Plaintiff Scott Linman. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Prosser, Nathan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Marten Transport, Ltd. served on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Regan, Anne)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Marten Transport, Ltd. (lak)
April 12, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 12, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marten Transport, Ltd., ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3035690.), filed by Scott Linman. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Regan, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linman, Scott v. Marten Transport, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Linman
Represented By: Anne Troy Regan
Represented By: M. Anderson Berry
Represented By: Nathan D. Prosser
Represented By: Terence Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marten Transport Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marten Transport, Ltd.
Represented By: Jordan O'Donnell
Represented By: Jordan S. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?