Loch, Joan v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joan Loch
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00213
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. American Family Mutual Insurance Company answer due 6/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/10/2022. (jls)
June 10, 2022 Filing 10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Simmons, Kendra)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #7 Stipulated for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead #1 Complaint. American Family Mutual Insurance Company answer due 6/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/16/2022. (jls)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Joseph Sokolowski Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/16/2022. (lak)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Penick, Bridget)
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Joseph Sokolowski Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3056273.) by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Sokolowski, Joseph)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed. American Family Mutual Insurance Company served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. (Murshid, Summer)
April 21, 2022 Filing fee received: $402, receipt number 34690040477. (arw)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (lak)
April 18, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 18, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Joan Loch, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Consent to Join, Camile Grandbois, #2 Exhibit C - Consent to Join, Kocina Sharon, #3 Exhibit D - Consent to Join, Nancy Ochs) (Murshid, Summer) Modified on 4/13/2022. (lak)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Joan Loch. (Murshid, Summer)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company., filed by Joan Loch. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I., #3 Notice of Filing Consent to Join, #4 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Wage Claim, Joan Loch) (Murshid, Summer) Modified on 4/13/2022. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loch, Joan v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Loch
Represented By: Summer Hart Murshid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bridget Penick
Represented By: Joseph Sokolowski
Represented By: Kendra D. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?