Simonson, Nicole v. I.Q. Data International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Simonson
Defendant: I.Q. Data International, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00215
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. I.Q. Data International, Inc. answer due 6/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/27/2022. (rks)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant I.Q. Data International, Inc.. Response due 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gamboa, Paul)
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul Gamboa for Defendant I.Q. Data International, Inc.. (Gamboa, Paul)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 4/22/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Panvini, Joseph)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. I.Q. Data International, Inc. served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Panvini, Joseph)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Defendants. (lak)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I.Q. Data International, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3038341.), filed by Nicole Simonson. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Panvini, Joseph) Modified on 4/15/2022. (lak)
April 15, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 15, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simonson, Nicole v. I.Q. Data International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Simonson
Represented By: Joseph Michael Panvini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.Q. Data International, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?