Benefit Administrative Services International Corporation et al v. Total Administrative Services Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Benefit Administrative Services International Corporation, Ralph Michael Stoddard, Frederick C. Teutsch and Robert Hayes
Defendant: Total Administrative Services Corporation, BASIC Benefits, LLC and BASIC Payroll, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00218
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #12 Stipulation for Second Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. BASIC Benefits, LLC, BASIC Payroll, LLC, and Total Administrative Services Corporation answer due 6/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/7/2022. (arw)
June 7, 2022 Filing 12 Stipulation for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants BASIC Benefits, LLC, BASIC Payroll, LLC, Total Administrative Services Corporation. (Constantine, Emily)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Total Administrative Services Corporation answer due 6/10/2022; BASIC Benefits, LLC answer due 6/10/2022; BASIC Payroll, LLC answer due 6/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/9/2022. (kwf)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants BASIC Benefits, LLC, BASIC Payroll, LLC, Total Administrative Services Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Constantine, Emily)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily Ann Constantine for Defendants BASIC Benefits, LLC, BASIC Payroll, LLC, Total Administrative Services Corporation. (Constantine, Emily)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed. Total Administrative Services Corporation served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. (Hancock, Mark)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. BASIC Payroll, LLC served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022. (Hancock, Mark)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed. BASIC Benefits, LLC served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022. (Hancock, Mark)
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
April 19, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
April 19, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Maxted Lenz for Plaintiffs Benefit Administrative Services International Corporation, Robert Hayes, Ralph Michael Stoddard, Frederick C. Teutsch. (Lenz, Maxted)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Lee Johanningmeier for Plaintiffs Benefit Administrative Services International Corporation, Robert Hayes, Ralph Michael Stoddard, Frederick C. Teutsch. (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Benefit Administrative Services International Corporation. (Hancock, Mark)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3039002.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Total Administrative Services Corporation, #3 Summons to BASIC Benefits, LLC, #4 Summons to BASIC Payroll, LLC) (Hancock, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benefit Administrative Services International Corporation et al v. Total Administrative Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benefit Administrative Services International Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Represented By: Maxted Lenz
Represented By: Mark Warren Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Michael Stoddard
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Represented By: Maxted Lenz
Represented By: Mark Warren Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick C. Teutsch
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Represented By: Maxted Lenz
Represented By: Mark Warren Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hayes
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Represented By: Maxted Lenz
Represented By: Mark Warren Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Administrative Services Corporation
Represented By: Emily Ann Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASIC Benefits, LLC
Represented By: Emily Ann Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASIC Payroll, LLC
Represented By: Emily Ann Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?