King, Perry v. Keyes, Randy
Petitioner: Perry King
Respondent: Randy Keyes
Case Number: 3:2022cv00248
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from petitioner requesting expedited proceedings to be allowed to attend mother's funeral. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to Expedite and/or Grant Appeal Bond by Petitioner Perry King. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
May 10, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34690040569. (jef),(ps)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner submits a $5 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP w/ a Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/04/2022. (aom),(ps)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 Memorandum of Law in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Perry King (aom),(ps)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, filed by Perry King. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King, Perry v. Keyes, Randy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Perry King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Keyes
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?