Biggers, Vanessa v. National Presto Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vanessa Biggers
Defendant: National Presto Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00252
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 8/29/2022. Dispositive Motions due 5/26/2023. Settlement Letters due 9/15/2023. Motions in Limine due 9/22/2023. Response to Motion due 10/6/2023. First Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 04:00 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2023 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/30/2023 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/29/2022. (voc)
June 29, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/28/2022 [:15] (cak)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff Vanessa Biggers. (Kress, Adam)
May 23, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Schupp, Timothy)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Schupp, Timothy)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Presto Industries, Inc. (lak)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Presto Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3051814.), filed by Vanessa Biggers. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kress, Adam) Modified on 5/6/2022. (lak)
May 6, 2022 Case directly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
May 6, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggers, Vanessa v. National Presto Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Biggers
Represented By: Adam John Kress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Presto Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R Schupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?