Eaton, Clifford v. Keyes, Randy
Petitioner: Clifford Eaton
Respondent: Randy Keyes
Case Number: 3:2022cv00308
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Aragorn Bugni for Petitioner Clifford Eaton. (Bugni, Joseph),(ps)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/22/2022. (jef),(ps)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to submit the filing fee payment by Petitioner Clifford Eaton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
June 16, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34690040761. (jef),(ps)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/31/2022. (aom),(ps)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Clifford Eaton. (aom),(ps)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, filed by Clifford Eaton. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Exhibit A - BOP Incident Report, #4 Exhibit B - BOP Discipline Hearing Officer Report, #5 Exhibit C - BOP Regional Admin Remedy Appeal, #6 Exhibit D - Part B - Response, #7 Exhibit E - BOP Central Office Admin Remedy Appeal, #8 Exhibit F - Admin Remedy No. 912168 Part b Response, #9 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton, Clifford v. Keyes, Randy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford Eaton
Represented By: Joseph Aragorn Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Keyes
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?