Nieves, Luis v. Fuchs, Larry
Petitioner: Luis A. Nieves
Respondent: Larry Fuchs
Not Classified By Court: CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2022cv00337
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Filing 4 JUDGMENT is entered dismissing this case. (lam),(ps)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 petition for compassionate release. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/5/2022. (lam),(ps)
June 27, 2022 Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number 34690040801. (lam),(ps)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing petitioner to submit $5 fee or a motion for leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee and trust fund account statement by 7/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/17/2022. (jef),(ps)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 Petition for Compassionate Release / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Luis A. Nieves. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Letter to Warden Larry Fuchs, interview/information requests, #2 Circuit Court of Milwaukee County decisions, motions, #3 Health Records) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nieves, Luis v. Fuchs, Larry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis A. Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Fuchs
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_habeas actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?