Gehrking, Robert et al v. Bank of America, NA et al
Plaintiff: Robert R Gehrking, Robert R. Gehrking and Gehrking Family Revocable Living Trust
Defendant: Bank of America, NA and JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA
Case Number: 3:2022cv00356
Filed: July 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (rks)
August 29, 2022 Third Action Request: Counsel to promptly file completed civil cover sheet. (jat)
July 14, 2022 Action Requested: Counsel to promptly file completed civil cover sheet. (lak)
July 11, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Defendants. (lak)
July 11, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
July 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
July 11, 2022 Action Requested: Counsel to promptly file completed civil cover sheet. (lak)
July 8, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3088504.), filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Applbaum, Marc) Modified on 7/8/2022: Added additional plaintiff and added additional defendant. Civil cover sheet filed? (lak)
July 7, 2022 Action Requested: Counsel to promptly file case initiating documents. (lak)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #1 Motion to Admit Marc Steven Applbaum Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/5/2022. (lak)
July 4, 2022 Filing 1 Motion to Admit Marc Steven Applbaum Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number BWIWDC-3085760.) by Plaintiff Robert R. Gehrking. (Applbaum, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gehrking, Robert et al v. Bank of America, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R Gehrking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Gehrking
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gehrking Family Revocable Living Trust
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?