Freeman, Jake v. ShipRock Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jake Freeman
Defendant: ShipRock Management, Inc. and XYZ Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00361
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Record by Douglas County Circuit Court. (voc)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Stipulation to Remand to Douglas County . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/14/2022. (voc)
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 Joint Stipulation to Remand to Douglas County by Defendant ShipRock Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Solheim, Mark)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 Affidavit of Toby E. Marcovich filed by Plaintiff Jake Freeman re: #3 Motion to Remand. (lak)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Jake Freeman. Brief in Opposition due 7/28/2022. Brief in Reply due 8/8/2022. (Marcovich, Toby) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/8/2022) (lak). Modified on 7/14/2022 (voc).
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant ShipRock Management, Inc.. (Solheim, Mark)
July 1, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
July 1, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, Douglas County, case number 2022CV000136. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3084558), filed by ShipRock Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Solheim, Mark) (Main Document replaced and additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2022: #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents) (lak). Modified on 6/30/2022: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman, Jake v. ShipRock Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Freeman
Represented By: Toby Erwin Marcovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ShipRock Management, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?