United States of America v. Howard, Jacqueline et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jacqueline R. Howard, State of Wisconsin and Prairie Pointe Condominium Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00390
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Jacqueline R. Howard served on 9/1/2022, answer due 9/22/2022. (Bresnahan, James)
August 4, 2022 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Prairie Pointe Condominium Association, Inc.. Prairie Pointe Condominium Association, Inc. waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Goerlitz, Jared)
August 4, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Jared Matthew Goerlitz for Defendant Prairie Pointe Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Goerlitz, Jared)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant State of Wisconsin. State of Wisconsin waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Bresnahan, James)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER by Defendant State of Wisconsin. (McNeilly, James) Modified on 8/1/2022: Answer of Wisconsin Department of Revenue. (lak)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Documents filed by James W. McNeilly, Jr for Defendant State of Wisconsin. (McNeilly, James) Modified on 8/1/2022: Appearance for State of Wisconsin, Department of Revenue. (lak)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
July 19, 2022 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related case 21-cv-310-wmc. (lak)
July 19, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Bresnahan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Howard, Jacqueline et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Francis Bresnahan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline R. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: James W. McNeilly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Pointe Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Matthew Goerlitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?