Randall, Stacy v. Widen, Reed et al
Plaintiff: STACY L. RANDALL
Defendant: REED C. WIDEN, MICHAEL KIESLER, WIDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC and WINDY WATERS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00400
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Michael Kiesler, Reed C. Widen, Widen Enterprises, LLC, Windy Waters, Inc.. All Defendants. (Palay, David)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Motion to Seal #2 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/25/22. (jat)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
July 22, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan S. Stippich for Plaintiff Stacy L. Randall. (Stippich, Ryan)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark A. Cameli for Plaintiff Stacy L. Randall. (Cameli, Mark)
July 22, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
July 22, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
July 21, 2022 Filing 6 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, filed by Stacy L. Randall. Exhibit G - 2019 Financial Statements for Widen Enterprises (un-audited.) (Sealed Document) (Palay, David) Modified on 7/22/2022. (lak)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, filed by Stacy L. Randall. Exhibit E - Contract between Widen Enterprises and SEG dated January 27, 2021. (Sealed Document) (Palay, David) Modified on 7/22/2022. (lak)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, filed by Stacy L. Randall. Exhibit D - Funds Flow. (Sealed Document) (Palay, David) Modified on 7/22/2022. (lak)
July 21, 2022 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, filed by Stacy L. Randall. Exhibit C - Equity Purchase Agreement dated August 17, 2021. (Sealed Document) (Palay, David) Modified on 7/22/2022. (lak)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Stacy L. Randall. (Palay, David) Modified on 7/22/2022. (lak)
July 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reed C. Widen, Michael Kiesler, Widen Enterprises, LLC, Windy Waters, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3095191.), filed by Stacy L. Randall, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Michael Kiesler, #3 Summons - Reed Widen, #4 Summons - Widen Enterprises LLC, #5 Summons - Windy Waters, Inc., #6 Exhibit A - Stock Redemption Agreement dated May 13, 2020, #7 Exhibit B - Promissory Note dated May 13, 2020, #8 Exhibit C - Redacted Equity Purchase Agreement dated August 17, 2021, #9 Exhibit D - Redacted Funds Flow, #10 Exhibit E - Redacted Contract between Widen Enterprises and SEG dated January 27, 2021, #11 Exhibit F - Email from J. Friedman dated October 14, 2021 (without Attachments), #12 Exhibit G - Redacted 2019 Financial Statements for Widen Enterprises (un-audited)) (Palay, David) Modified on 7/22/2022. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall, Stacy v. Widen, Reed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY L. RANDALL
Represented By: David Palay
Represented By: Ryan S. Stippich
Represented By: Mark A. Cameli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REED C. WIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KIESLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIDEN ENTERPRISES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINDY WATERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?