EMCASCO Insurance Company v. Northern Metal Fab, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: EMCASCO Insurance Company
Defendant: Northern Metal Fab, Inc. and Ellicott Dredges, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00443
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against EMCASCO Insurance Company by Northern Metal Fab, Inc. (Mitchell, Kurt) Modified on 10/14/2022. (lak)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Jordan D. Rosenfeld Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/29/2022. (lak)
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 Motion to Admit Jordan Rosenfeld Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3131957.) by Defendant Ellicott Dredges, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Rosenfeld, Jordan)
September 22, 2022 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Ellicott Dredges, LLC. Ellicott Dredges, LLC waiver sent on 8/14/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Warner, Stephen) Modified on 9/23/2022: waiver sent and answer date corrected (jls).
August 18, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 18, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northern Metal Fab, Inc. and Ellicott Dredges, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3109396.), filed by EMCASCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Demand for Arbitration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Arbitration Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Insurance Policy (redacted), #5 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Warner, Stephen) Modified on 8/18/2022 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMCASCO Insurance Company v. Northern Metal Fab, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMCASCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen M. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Metal Fab, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Michael Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellicott Dredges, LLC
Represented By: Jordan Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?