JL & JM Enterprises, LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: JL & JM Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00496
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Excise Tax
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 Declaration of Attorney Kathleen M. Quinn as to Service of Summons and Complaint on the United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mail Receipt (US Attorney's Office), #2 Exhibit Mail Receipt (Attorney General's Office), #3 Exhibit Mail Receipt (Tax Division)) (Quinn, Kathleen)
October 19, 2022 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (rks)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (lak)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against United States of America. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3117630.), filed by JL & JM Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nov. 23, 2016 Notice of Assessments, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript Reflecting Payments of Excise Taxes Assessed and Interest, #3 Exhibit 3 - Form 720X, Amended Quarterly Federal Excise Tax Return filed Feb 26, 2019, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dec. 30, 2019 Thorough Protest, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sept. 12, 2020 IRS Letter Allowing 30% of Claim for Refund, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons - United States Attorney's Office, #8 Summons - Attorney General's Office, #9 Summons - Dept. of Justice, Tax Division) (Quinn, Kathleen) Modified on 9/2/2022. (lak)
September 2, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
September 2, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff JL & JM Enterprises, LLC. (Quinn, Kathleen)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 Disregard. Modified on 9/2/2022. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JL & JM Enterprises, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL & JM Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?