Hamilton, Richard v. Prime Communications, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Richard M. Hamilton
Defendant: Prime Communications, L.P. and Twin City Fire Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00583
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Megan Beth McCormick for Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (McCormick, Megan)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Loringer, John)
November 23, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by John Patrick Loringer for Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Loringer, John)
November 23, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Loringer, John)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Twin City Fire Insurance Co. served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Balmer, James)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. Prime Communications, L.P. served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (rks) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/14/2022) (rks).
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Prime Communications, L.P., Twin City Fire Insurance Co. (lak)
October 13, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
October 13, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 Disregard. Modified on 10/12/2022. (lak)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3139430.), filed by Richard M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Prime Communications, L.P., #3 Summons - Twin City Fire Insurance Co.) (Balmer, James) Modified on 10/12/2022. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton, Richard v. Prime Communications, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard M. Hamilton
Represented By: James Walter Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Communications, L.P.
Represented By: John Patrick Loringer
Represented By: Megan Beth McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?