Dagenais, Mark v. Franks, Aadam et al
Plaintiff: Mark Dagenais and The Honorable Denis Richard McDonough
Defendant: Aadam J. Franks, ABC Insurance Company, SBH Holdings LLC doing business as ScienceBased Health, DEF Insurance Company, GHI Insurance Company, ScienceBased Health LLC doing business as ScienceBased Health, JKL Insurance Company, MNO Sales Company, PQR Insurance Company, STU Health Company and VWX Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00593
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties have notified the court that they have reached a settlement. Dkt. #10 . Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Any party may move to reopen the case for good cause. Any party may move to convert the dismissal to one with prejudice after the terms of the settlement have been satisfied. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/18/2022. (voc)
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Settlement by Defendants SBH Holdings LLC, SBH Holdings LLC, ScienceBased Health LLC (Hatchell, Eric)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant SBH Holdings, LLC has filed a supplement to its notice of removal in response to this court's order asking for more information about whether the court has jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. The court is persuaded that the notice and the supplement adequately allege all of the requirements for 1332 at the pleading stage. At summary judgment or trial, or if plaintiff later challenges the exercise of jurisdiction, plaintiff will have to come forward with specific evidence identifying each party's citizenship. See Lujan v. Nat'l Wildlife Fed'n, 497 U.S. 871, 888 (1990). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/15/2022. (voc)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 Notice by Defendant ScienceBased Health LLC re 7 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. . (Hatchell, Eric)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendants SBH Holdings LLC and ScienceBased Health LLC have removed this action from state court, relying solely on 28 U.S.C. 1332 as a basis for jurisdiction. But the allegations in the notice of removal don't provide the court with enough information to determine whether there is complete diversity of citizenship, which is one of the requirements of 1332. Specifically, defendants allege that "no members of SBH Holdings nor ScienceBased Health are citizens of the State of Wisconsin" but they don't identify any of defendants' members or their citizenships. Dkt. 1, 13. A party seeking to establish diversity jurisdiction over a case in which an LLC is a party must list the citizenships of all members of the LLC, and if any of those members have members, the citizenships of their members must be listed as well. Thomas v. Guardsmark, LLC, 487 F.3d 531, 534 (7th Cir. 2007). So, defendants have until November 14, 2022, to file supplemental materials showing that the court may exercise subject matter jurisdiction over this case. If defendants don't respond, the court will remand the case to state court. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/28/22. (jat)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #5 Stipulation to Extend Defendants SBH Holdings LLC and ScienceBased Health, LLC's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer due 11/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/27/2022. (jls)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 Stipulation to Extend Defendants SBH Holdings LLC and ScienceBased Health, LLC's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants SBH Holdings LLC, SBH Holdings LLC, ScienceBased Health LLC. (Hatchell, Eric)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant ScienceBased Health LLC. (Mette, Bryan) Modified on 10/25/2022. (lak)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants SBH Holdings LLC. (Mette, Bryan) Modified on 10/25/2022. (lak)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SBH Holdings LLC. (Mette, Bryan) Modified on 10/25/2022. (lak)
October 21, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
October 21, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 2022-cv-002388. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3144333), filed by SBH Holdings LLC, ScienceBased Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Process; Summons; Complaint; Notice of Appearance (Hatchell); Notice of Appearance (Mette), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet w/ attachment) (Mette, Bryan)
October 20, 2022 Action Requested: Counsel to promptly file case initiating documents. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dagenais, Mark v. Franks, Aadam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Dagenais
Represented By: Jason Scott Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Honorable Denis Richard McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aadam J. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBH Holdings LLC doing business as ScienceBased Health
Represented By: Bryan Theron Mette
Represented By: Eric Joseph Hatchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ScienceBased Health LLC doing business as ScienceBased Health
Represented By: Bryan Theron Mette
Represented By: Eric Joseph Hatchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNO Sales Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PQR Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STU Health Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VWX Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?