Boyer, Gregory v. USA Medical & Psychological Staffing et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Boyer
Defendant: USA Medical & Psychological Staffing, Norman Johnson, Travis Schamber, Wesley Harmston and Jillian Bresnahan
Case Number: 3:2022cv00723
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Norman Johnson. Norman Johnson waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Makar, Maria) Modified on 2/9/2023: Waiver sent 1/31/2023. (lak)
February 9, 2023 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jillian Bresnahan. Jillian Bresnahan waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Makar, Maria) Modified on 2/9/2023: Waiver sent 1/31/2023. (lak)
February 7, 2023 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Travis Schamber. Travis Schamber waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Makar, Maria) Modified on 2/8/2023: Waiver sent 1/31/2023. (lak)
February 7, 2023 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wesley Harmston. Wesley Harmston waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Makar, Maria) Modified on 2/8/2023: Waiver sent 1/31/2023. (lak)
February 7, 2023 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant USA Medical & Psychological Staffing. USA Medical & Psychological Staffing waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Makar, Maria) Modified on 2/8/2023: Waiver sent 1/31/2023. (lak)
February 3, 2023 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (rks)
February 2, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Maria Makar for Plaintiff Gregory Boyer. (Makar, Maria)
February 2, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen H. Weil for Plaintiff Gregory Boyer. (Weil, Stephen)
December 21, 2022 Case directly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related case 20-cv-1123. (lak)
December 21, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
December 20, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Edwards Art for Plaintiff Gregory Boyer. (Art, Steven)
December 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3170484.), filed by Gregory Boyer. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Art, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer, Gregory v. USA Medical & Psychological Staffing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Boyer
Represented By: Steven Edwards Art
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Represented By: Maria Makar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Medical & Psychological Staffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Schamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Harmston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?