Zloza, Joseph v. New Lisbon Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Zloza
Defendant: New Lisbon Police Department, Juneau County Courthouse, Sheryl Alberts and Brent Granger
Case Number: 3:2023cv00059
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Dismissing #7 Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Amended Complaint due 4/3/2023. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/13/2023. (acd),(ps)
March 6, 2023 Filing 8 Third Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Zloza. (lam),(ps)
March 6, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Joseph Zloza. (Attachments: #1 Copy of dkt. #6 Order, #2 Envelope). (lam),(ps)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint. Amended Complaint due 3/15/2023. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/22/2023. (acd),(ps)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/7/2023. (jef),(ps)
February 6, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Zloza. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on IFP request: Amended Affidavit of Indigency due 2/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/30/2023. (lam),(ps)
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Zloza. (lam),(ps)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Joseph Zloza. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (lam),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zloza, Joseph v. New Lisbon Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Zloza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Lisbon Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juneau County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?