Harris, Demond v. City of La Crosse et al
Plaintiff: Demond Harris
Defendant: City of La Crosse, Graham Eddy, Craig Teff and Sam Clason
Case Number: 3:2023cv00062
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy M. Johnson for Defendants City of La Crosse, Sam Clason, Graham Eddy, Craig Teff. (Johnson, Timothy)
February 21, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel C. Hall, Jr for Defendants City of La Crosse, Sam Clason, Graham Eddy, Craig Teff. (Hall, Samuel)
February 5, 2023 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Sam Clason. Sam Clason waiver sent on 1/31/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Goldman, Lisa)
February 5, 2023 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Graham Eddy. Graham Eddy waiver sent on 1/31/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Goldman, Lisa)
February 5, 2023 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Craig Teff. Craig Teff waiver sent on 1/31/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Goldman, Lisa)
February 5, 2023 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant City of La Crosse. City of La Crosse waiver sent on 1/31/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Goldman, Lisa)
February 2, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Demond Harris. (Goldman, Lisa)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3187488.), filed by Demond Harris. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldman, Lisa) Modified on 1/27/2023. (lak)
January 27, 2023 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
January 27, 2023 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris, Demond v. City of La Crosse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demond Harris
Represented By: Bruce M. Davey
Represented By: Lisa Claire Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of La Crosse
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Eddy
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Teff
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Clason
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?