Henderson, Ryan v. Jokala, Tracie et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Henderson
Defendant: Tracie A. Jokala, City of Madison and Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv00121
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2023 Filing 11 Declaration of Oyvind Wistrom filed by Defendants City of Madison, Tracie A. Jokala, Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company re: #7 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Memorandum of Understanding (MOU) that was signed by Plaintiff Ryan Henderson on January 19, 2021, #2 Exhibit B - Resignation letter submitted by Plaintiff Henderson, #3 Exhibit C - Brady/Giglio letter that was sent to the Dane County District Attorney's Office on July 1, 2021) (Wistrom, Oyvind)
April 14, 2023 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 5/15/2023. (lak)
April 13, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants City of Madison, Tracie A. Jokala, Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company. (Wistrom, Oyvind)
April 13, 2023 Filing 9 Disregard. Modified on 4/18/2023. (lak)
April 13, 2023 Filing 8 Brief in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants City of Madison, Tracie A. Jokala, Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company (Wistrom, Oyvind)
April 13, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants City of Madison, Tracie A. Jokala, Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company. Brief in Opposition due 5/4/2023. Brief in Reply due 5/15/2023. (Wistrom, Oyvind)
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company. Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Gingras, Robert)
February 24, 2023 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant City of Madison. City of Madison waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Gingras, Robert)
February 24, 2023 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Tracie A. Jokala. Tracie A. Jokala waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Gingras, Robert)
February 22, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tracie A. Jokala, City of Madison and Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company. (lak)
February 22, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
February 22, 2023 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
February 21, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kimberly Dawn Sweatt for Plaintiff Ryan Henderson. (Sweatt, Kimberly)
February 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Madison, Tracie A. Jokala, Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3201461.), filed by Ryan Henderson. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Jokala, #3 Summons - City of Madison, #4 Summons - WMMIC) (Gingras, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson, Ryan v. Jokala, Tracie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Henderson
Represented By: Robert John Gingras
Represented By: Kimberly Dawn Sweatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracie A. Jokala
Represented By: Oyvind Wistrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison
Represented By: Oyvind Wistrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Oyvind Wistrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?