Starlin, Julius v. Madison Auto Center LLC
Plaintiff: Julius Starlin
Defendant: Madison Auto Center LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00133
Filed: February 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Madison Auto Center LLC. (Link, Michael)
April 27, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant Madison Auto Center LLC. (Link, Michael)
March 14, 2023 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Madison Auto Center LLC. Madison Auto Center LLC waiver sent on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (lak)
March 14, 2023 Filing 4 Disregard. Modified on 3/14/2023. (lak)
February 27, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Madison Auto Center LLC. (lak)
February 27, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Julius Starlin. (Stern, Walter)
February 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madison Auto Center LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3204235.), filed by Julius Starlin. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - DWD Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - EEOC Letter, #5 Exhibit C - Right to Sue Letter, #6 Exhibit D - Unemployment Decision) (Stern, Walter) Modified on 2/27/2023. (lak)
February 27, 2023 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
February 27, 2023 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starlin, Julius v. Madison Auto Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Starlin
Represented By: Walter Wolf Stern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Auto Center LLC
Represented By: Michael Richard Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?