The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC et al v. The Town of Minocqua et al
Plaintiff: The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC and Kirk C. Bangstad
Defendant: The Town of Minocqua, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, John Thompson, Does 1-10, Brian Fricke, Erika Peterson, Does 3-10, The County of Oneida, Scott Holewinski, Karl Jennrich, Todd Troskey and Roes 1-10
Case Number: 3:2023cv00578
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiffs have filed an amended complaint within the deadline set by the court for amending the pleadings without leave of court. As a result, defendants' motion to dismiss, Dkt. #19 , is DENIED as moot. If defendants believe that plaintiffs' new complaint is also defective, defendants will have to file a new motion. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/20/2023. (nln)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does 3-10, Brian Fricke, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, Erika Peterson, The Town of Minocqua, John Thompson, filed by Kirk C. Bangstad, The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC. (Potts, Brian)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court accepts the parties' newly-stipulated dates and deadlines regarding a second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/12/2023. (nln)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Amendments to Pleadings due 10/16/2023. Defendants' Answer or responsive pleading due 10/31/2023. (nln)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Second Stipulation on Answer Deadlines and Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Does 3-10, Brian Fricke, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, Erika Peterson, The Town of Minocqua, John Thompson. (Bitar, Remzy)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #31 Stipulation on Answer Deadlines and Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/05/2023. (nln)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Stipulation on Answer Deadlines and Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Does 3-10, Brian Fricke, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, Erika Peterson, The Town of Minocqua, John Thompson. (Bitar, Remzy) Modified on 10/5/2023 (jls).
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Todd Troskey served on 9/23/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. John Thompson served on 9/23/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Brian Fricke served on 9/23/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Karl Jennrich served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. The Town of Minocqua served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Scott Holewinski served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Susan Heil served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Mark Hartzheim served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Erika Peterson served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Potts, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. The County of Oneida served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Potts, Brian)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Action Request: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 10/19/2023. (lak)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Brief in Support of #19 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Does 3-10, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, The Town of Minocqua, John Thompson (Bitar, Remzy)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Does 3-10, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, The Town of Minocqua, John Thompson. Brief in Opposition due 10/10/2023. Brief in Reply due 10/19/2023. (Bitar, Remzy)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Procopio for Defendants Does 3-10, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, The Town of Minocqua, John Thompson. (Procopio, Gregory)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Matteo Reginato for Defendants Does 3-10, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, The Town of Minocqua, John Thompson. (Reginato, Matteo)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Remzy Bitar for Defendants Does 3-10, Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, The Town of Minocqua, John Thompson. (Bitar, Remzy)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Susan Heil served on 8/27/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Potts, Brian)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Mark Hartzheim served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023. (Potts, Brian)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. John Thompson served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023. (Potts, Brian)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. The Town of Minocqua served on 8/28/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Potts, Brian)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summonses Issued. (lak)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Kirk C. Bangstad, The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC. (Potts, Brian)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Kirk C. Bangstad, The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC. (Potts, Brian)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Kirk C. Bangstad, The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC. (Potts, Brian)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Kirk C. Bangstad, The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC. (Potts, Brian)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Kirk C. Bangstad, The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC. (Potts, Brian)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Kirk C. Bangstad, The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC. (Potts, Brian)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC, Kirk C. Bangstad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Z Best Bikes Photo, #2 Exhibit B - Selected Parking Waivers 2020-2023, #3 Exhibit C - We Love You Kirk Screenshot 1, #4 Exhibit D - We Love You Kirk Screenshot 2, #5 Exhibit E - We Love You Kirk Website Images, #6 Exhibit F - Draft Town Board Minutes from 12.21.2021, #7 Exhibit G - Town Board Letter RE MBC ARP Conditions, #8 Exhibit H - Gregory Harrold Letter RE 329 East Front Street, #9 Exhibit I - John Thompson Facebook Post, #10 Exhibit J - Swearinger Website Images, #11 Exhibit K - Jennrich Email RE Ordinance Enforcement, #12 Exhibit L - Letter to Oneida County Board from Chris Naumann, #13 Exhibit M - Email to Hartzheim RE Enforcement Actions against MBC, #14 Exhibit N - Ordinance Enforcement Letter RE Biden Sign, #15 Exhibit O - Email RE Preventing MBC from Placing Political Signs, #16 Exhibit P - Minocqua Brewing Company ARP Conditions, #17 Exhibit Q - County Committee Meeting Minutes 4.19.23, #18 Exhibit R - Email RE Oakfire Pizza and Wild Turkey Dumpsters) (Potts, Brian)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Kirk C. Bangstad, The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC. (Potts, Brian)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mark Hartzheim, Susan Heil, The Town of Minocqua and John Thompson. (lak)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3294699.), filed by The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC, Kirk C. Bangstad. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Mark Hartzheim, #3 Summons to Susan Heil, #4 Summons to John Thompson, #5 Summons to The Town of Minocqua) (Potts, Brian) Modified on 8/24/2023: Deleted duplicate text. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC et al v. The Town of Minocqua et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Minocqua Brewing Company LLC
Represented By: Brian H Potts
Represented By: Frederick Benjamin Melms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk C. Bangstad
Represented By: Brian H Potts
Represented By: Frederick Benjamin Melms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Minocqua
Represented By: Gregory Procopio
Represented By: Matteo Reginato
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hartzheim
Represented By: Gregory Procopio
Represented By: Matteo Reginato
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Heil
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: Gregory Procopio
Represented By: Matteo Reginato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thompson
Represented By: Gregory Procopio
Represented By: Matteo Reginato
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fricke
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Peterson
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 3-10
Represented By: Gregory Procopio
Represented By: Matteo Reginato
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Oneida
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Holewinski
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Jennrich
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Troskey
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roes 1-10
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?