Tims, Dennis v. Struensee, Steven et al
Plaintiff: Dennis John Tims, J.R.T. and H.D.T.
Defendant: Steven Struensee, Aaron Bemenister, Alexander Cattanach, Scott Haines and Melissa Inlow
Not Classified By Court: WCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2023cv00656
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff Dennis Tims has filed notice with this Court that Waupun Correction Institution has been withholding unspecified legal documents. (Dkt. #15 .) The court will take no action on this notice, as Tims's case is currently under review for screening, and he does not need to file anything. The court will also address his motion for in camera inspection (dkt. #10 ) and his letter regarding discovery (dkt. #14 ) when it screens his case. In the meantime, Tims should continue to work with his institution to get access to his legal documents, and if his case is allowed to proceed after screening and the institution continues to deny him his legal documents, he may file a renewed notice with the court listing the specific documents withheld. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/30/2023. (nln),(ps)
October 26, 2023 Filing 15 Notice/Letter by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims to Magistrate Judge Andrew Wiseman regarding WCI withholding his mail. (Attachments: #1 Interview/Information Request) (voc),(ps)
October 23, 2023 Filing 14 Letter to Magistrate Judge Andrew Wiseman regarding case by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clark County Sheriff's Office requesting records, #2 Interview / Information Request) (jef),(ps) Modified on 10/23/2023 (jef).
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 10/18/2023. (nln),(ps)
October 18, 2023 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 1801. (nln),(ps)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Dennis John Tims's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Full $402 filing fee due 10/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 10/06/2023. (nln),(ps)
October 4, 2023 Filing 11 Brief in Support of #10 Motion for In Camera Judicial Inspection, filed by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims. (nln),(ps)
October 4, 2023 Filing 10 Motion for In Camera Judicial Inspection (Proposed) by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims. (Attachments: #1 Diagram) (nln),(ps)
October 4, 2023 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2023: #1 IFP Determination) (nln).
October 4, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to the Court filed by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims re #7 Order. (Attachments: #1 Interview/Information Request / E-Filing Request) (nln),(ps)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Trust Fund Account Statement due 10/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 9/22/2023. (jef),(ps)
September 22, 2023 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, August 2023, by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims. (jef),(ps)
September 22, 2023 Filing 5 DOC Interview/Information Request Form with request that the court make a copy of the USB thumb drive containing exhibits for examination during litigation and return the original USB thumb drive to WCI by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims. (jls),(ps)
September 22, 2023 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dennis John Tims. (jef),(ps) Redacted minor children's names. (jef)
September 22, 2023 Filing 3 Declaration of Dennis John Tims filed by Dennis John Tims. (jef),(ps)
September 22, 2023 Filing 2 Brief in Support to #1 Complaint filed by Dennis John Tims. (jef),(ps)
September 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis John Tims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Compel and Exhibits 1-11 Sheriff's Office Report, letters, other papers, #2 Exhibit B - Circuit Court of Clark County orders, 8/3/2023, #3 Exhibit C - Motion for Sanctions and Dismissal of Cases 17cf116, 120 and 18cm028, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Request Clark County Circuit Court Have Subpoenas Served and Enforced and Exhibit Letters, Demand for Discovery, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Envelope) (jef),(ps) Redacted minor children's names. (jef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tims, Dennis v. Struensee, Steven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis John Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Struensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Bemenister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Cattanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Inlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?