Gant, Jarrod v. Schmitz, Sawyer et al
Plaintiff: Jarrod Nicholas Gant
Defendant: Sawyer Schmitz, Lt. Radcliffe, Capt. Hartzheim, Sgt. Tjader, Brian Greff, Jessie Schneider, B. Kirst, Warden J. Benzel, E. Davidson, HSM Gugler, Jennifer Barczak, Sgt. Wells and Lt. Miller
Not Yet Classified: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2024cv00062
Filed: January 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2024 Filing 10 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps)
February 20, 2024 Partial Filing fee received: $1.54, receipt number 2368. (nln),(ps)
February 14, 2024 Filing 9 Signed copy of #7 Amended Complaint filed by Jarrod Nicholas Gant. (nln),(ps)
January 31, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to plaintiff regarding #7 Amended Complaint: The court has docketed this submission, however it is not signed as required by Rule 11(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Please sign the document and promptly resubmit it through the Prisoner E-Filing Program at your institution. (nln),(ps)
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (unsigned) by Plaintiff Jarrod Nicholas Gant. (nln),(ps) Modified on 1/31/2024 (nln).
January 29, 2024 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jarrod Nicholas Gant. (nln),(ps)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.54 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 1/25/2024. (jef),(ps)
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jarrod Nicholas Gant. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2024: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
January 25, 2024 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jarrod Nicholas Gant. (jef),(ps)
January 25, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Jarrod Nicholas Gant. (jef),(ps)
January 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jarrod Nicholas Gant. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gant, Jarrod v. Schmitz, Sawyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod Nicholas Gant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawyer Schmitz
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Radcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Hartzheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Tjader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Greff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Kirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden J. Benzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSM Gugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Barczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?