Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC et al v. RNA Real Estate, LLC
Plaintiff: RCL Services, LLC and Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC
Defendant: RNA Real Estate, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00480
Filed: July 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Anita Marie Boor
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2024 Filing 40 Brief in Reply by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC in Support of #30 Motion to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration (Goode, Joseph)
September 5, 2024 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. The parties are advised that a Rule 26(f) conference shall occur not less than two weeks before the preliminary pretrial conference, and that the parties' report or reports must be filed not less than one week before the preliminary pretrial conference.[#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
September 3, 2024 Filing 39 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC re: #30 Motion to Dismiss filed by RNA Real Estate, LLC (Luetkehans, Phillip)
September 3, 2024 Filing 38 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC in Support of #17 Motion to Remand (Luetkehans, Phillip)
August 21, 2024 Filing 37 Brief in Opposition by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC re: #17 Motion to Remand filed by Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC (Goode, Joseph)
August 13, 2024 Filing 36 Brief in Reply by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC in Support of #12 Order Regarding Jurisdiction,, (Reply to Plaintiff's Response) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Dkt. Nos. 35 & 36) (Goode, Joseph)
August 13, 2024 Filing 35 Brief in Reply by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC in Support of #11 Motion to Vacate Order Granting Temporary Injunction (Goode, Joseph)
August 13, 2024 Filing 34 Notice by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC re #25 Supplement . (Luetkehans, Phillip)
August 13, 2024 Filing 33 Affidavit of Kyle Czekalski re #25 Supplement . (Luetkehans, Phillip)
August 12, 2024 Filing 32 Certificate of Service by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC as to #30 MOTION TO DISMISS , #31 Brief in Support. (Goode, Joseph)
August 12, 2024 Filing 31 Brief in Support of #30 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Operating Agreement) (Goode, Joseph)
August 12, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 9/3/2024. Brief in Reply due 9/12/2024. (Goode, Joseph)
August 8, 2024 Filing 29 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC re: #11 Motion to Vacate filed by RNA Real Estate, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Temporary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Kyle Czekalski (Dkt. 28), #4 Exhibit Declaration of Frank Wagenbauer (Dkt. 22), #5 Exhibit Correspondence between Counsel, #6 Exhibit Operating Agreement) (Garner, Bruce)
August 8, 2024 Filing 28 Affidavit of Kyle Czekalski filed by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC re: #11 Motion to Vacate (Garner, Bruce)
August 8, 2024 Filing 27 Certificate of Service by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC as to #25 Supplement, #26 Declaration. (Goode, Joseph)
August 8, 2024 Filing 26 Declaration of Frank Wagenbauer re #25 Supplement (Goode, Joseph)
August 8, 2024 Filing 25 Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by RNA Real Estate, LLC (Goode, Joseph)
August 1, 2024 Filing 24 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC re #22 Declaration, #21 Affidavit, #23 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #20 Affidavit. (Luetkehans, Phillip) Modified on 8/1/2024. (lak)
July 31, 2024 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC. (Luetkehans, Phillip)
July 31, 2024 Filing 22 Declaration of Frank Wagenbauer filed by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC re: #17 Motion to Remand (Luetkehans, Phillip)
July 31, 2024 Filing 21 Affidavit of J.R. Hughes filed by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC re: #17 Motion to Remand (Luetkehans, Phillip)
July 31, 2024 Filing 20 Affidavit of Kyle Czekalski filed by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC re: #17 Motion to Remand (Luetkehans, Phillip)
July 31, 2024 Filing 19 Brief in Support of #17 Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease between RCL and RNA, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Order granting Temporary Injunction, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit RCL Operating Agreement, #6 Disregard, #7 Disregard, #8 Exhibit Rieder Corporate Website Photo, #9 Exhibit Delaware Corporate Search Website Photo, #10 Exhibit Correspondence between Counsel, #11 Disregard) (Luetkehans, Phillip) Modified on 8/1/2024. (lak)
July 31, 2024 Filing 18 Disregard. Modified on 7/31/2024. (lak)
July 31, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 8/21/2024. Brief in Reply due 9/3/2024. (Luetkehans, Phillip)
July 31, 2024 Action Requested: Plaintiff reminded to file completed corporate disclosure statement. (jat)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion to Admit Phillip A. Luetkehans Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Admit Brian J. Armstrong Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Admit Bruce E. Garner Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 7/30/2024. (lak)
July 30, 2024 Filing 15 Motion to Admit Bruce Edward Garner Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3466234.) by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC. (Garner, Bruce)
July 30, 2024 Filing 14 Motion to Admit Brian Armstrong Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3466201.) by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC. (Armstrong, Brian)
July 30, 2024 Filing 13 Motion to Admit Phillip A Luetkehans Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3466192.) by Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC. (Luetkehans, Phillip)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff Centerline Architectural Services, LLC has until 8/8/24, to show cause why RCL Services should not be dismissed and to respond to RNA Real Estate's motion to vacate the temporary injunction. Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC has until 8/8/24, to supplement its notice of removal to address the issues raised in this order regarding diversity of citizenship and the amount in controversy. Both parties will have until 8/13/24, to reply to the other party's response. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/25/24. (jat)
July 25, 2024 Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #11 Motion to Vacate Order Granting Temporary Injunction. Brief in Opposition due 8/8/2024. Brief in Reply due 8/13/2024. (jat)
July 22, 2024 Filing 11 Motion to Vacate Order Granting Temporary Injunction by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC. Response due 7/29/2024. (Goode, Joseph)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. #9 , is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until August 12, 2024 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 7/19/24. (jat)
July 19, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC. (Goode, Joseph)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion to Admit Christine K. Bush Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 7/19/2024. (lak)
July 18, 2024 Filing 7 Motion to Admit Christine K. Bush Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3460506.) by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC. (Bush, Christine)
July 17, 2024 Action Requested: Plaintiffs are reminded to file completed corporate disclosure statements. (lak)
July 17, 2024 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
July 17, 2024 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. (lak)
July 16, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC as to #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Declaration, #4 Notice of Appearance. (Goode, Joseph)
July 16, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC. (Goode, Joseph)
July 16, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Maura K. Logue for Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC. (Logue, Maura)
July 16, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant RNA Real Estate, LLC. (Goode, Joseph) Modified on 7/16/2024: E-mail sent to counsel. Current form filed? (lak)
July 16, 2024 Filing 2 Declaration of Frank Wagenbauer re: #1 Notice of Removal. (lak)
July 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rusk County Circuit Court, case number 24-CV-66. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3458962), filed by RNA Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint & Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - Email acknowledging RCL not locked out, #3 Exhibit C - Email objecting to ex parte relief, #4 Exhibit D - Order Granting Temporary Injunction, #5 Exhibit E - State Court docket entries, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Frank Wagenbauer, #7 Exhibit G - Operating Agreement for RCL Services LLC, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #9 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goode, Joseph) Modified on 7/16/2024. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC et al v. RNA Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNA Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Joseph S. Goode
Represented By: Maura K. Logue
Represented By: Christine K. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RCL Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centerline Architectural Supply, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Shawn Mayer
Represented By: Phillip A Luetkehans
Represented By: Bruce Edward Garner
Represented By: Brian Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?