Gagner, Neal v. G1 Therapeutics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Neal Gagner
Defendant: Glenn P. Muir, Jacks Lee, Cynthia L. Flowers, Garry A. Nicholson, John E. Bailey, Jr., Norman E. Sharpless, Alicia Secor and G1 Therapeutics Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00593
Filed: August 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Anita Marie Boor
Referring Judge: William M Conley
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff has filed a motion for extension of time to file a petition for fees and costs. Dkt. #18 . He asks for up to 90 days from the date of this order. Id. Plaintiff's motion generated a response deadline, which came and went with no comment from defendant. It is not clear whether plaintiff has a basis to seek fees in this case and even less clear whether the court would award any, but these are questions for another day. If plaintiff chooses to file a motion, he will be expected to provide his bases and follow this court's procedures on seeking fees. Although plaintiff's motion for extension of time essentially went unopposed, 90 days is far beyond the amount of time this court typically sets for such motions. The motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's materials are due October 18, 2024, and any response is due November 1, 2024. No reply is allowed unless invited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 10/4/24. (jat)
September 24, 2024 Filing 18 Motion for Extension of Time to file mootness fee petition by Plaintiff Neal Gagner. Response due 10/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Blythin, John) Modified on 9/24/2024. (lak)
September 12, 2024 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls)
September 11, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Neal Gagner (Blythin, John)
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Consistent with the representations of plaintiff's counsel (dkt. #15 ), the motion for preliminary injunction (dkt. #2 ) is DISMISSED AS MOOT. The court removes today's telephone status conference and plaintiff may have until September 27, 2024, to file his dismissal with prejudice, otherwise this matter will proceed under the court's ordinary schedule. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/6/2024. (voc)
September 6, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Plaintiff Neal Gagner re #2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Neal Gagner (as moot). (Fruchter, Jesse)
September 4, 2024 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Jesse Fruchter for Plaintiff Neal Gagner. (Fruchter, Jesse)
September 4, 2024 Set Telephone Status Conference: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/6/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. (jat)
September 4, 2024 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and US Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor. (lak)
August 29, 2024 Filing 13 Notice by Plaintiff Neal Gagner Plaintiff's response to Defendant's letter (Dkt. No. 11). (Blythin, John)
August 29, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant G1 Therapeutics Inc.. (Romashko, Robert)
August 29, 2024 Filing 11 Notice by Defendants John E. Bailey, Jr, Cynthia L. Flowers, G1 Therapeutics Inc., Jacks Lee, Glenn P. Muir, Garry A. Nicholson, Alicia Secor, Norman E. Sharpless . (Romashko, Robert)
August 29, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Romashko for Defendants John E. Bailey, Jr, Cynthia L. Flowers, G1 Therapeutics Inc., Jacks Lee, Glenn P. Muir, Garry A. Nicholson, Alicia Secor, Norman E. Sharpless. (Romashko, Robert)
August 29, 2024 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 9/3/2024. (lak)
August 29, 2024 Action Requested: Defendant G1 Therapeutics Inc.'s corporate disclosure statement is due. Please use this court's current form. (lak)
August 28, 2024 Filing 9 Declaration of Guri Ademi filed by Plaintiff Neal Gagner regarding acceptance of service of summons, complaint, motion for preliminary injunction, and Judge Boor's case opening documents re: 8 Text Only Order,,, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: email chain regarding acceptance of service) (Blythin, John)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff has filed a motion for a preliminary injunction seeking to "enjoin the consummation of the proposed acquisition of GI Therapeutics, Inc." Dkt. #2 at 1. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly file proof of service of the summons, complaint, motion for preliminary injunction and supporting documents, after which the court will set a briefing scheduling on plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, and to consult the court's procedures to be followed on motions for injunctive relief. #Preliminary Injunction Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 8/28/2024. (jls)
August 23, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
August 23, 2024 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Neal Gagner. (Blythin, John)
August 23, 2024 Filing 5 Declaration of John D. Blythin filed by Plaintiff Neal Gagner re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Recommendation Statement, #2 Exhibit B: Pharmacosmos Confidentiality Agreement, #3 Exhibit C: Amended Pharmacosmos Confidentiality Agreement, #4 Exhibit D: Merger Press Release, #5 Exhibit E: Merger Agreement) (Blythin, John)
August 23, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Neal Gagner re: #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (statement of facts) (Blythin, John)
August 23, 2024 Filing 3 Brief in Support of #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Neal Gagner (Blythin, John)
August 23, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Neal Gagner. (Blythin, John)
August 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3479419.), filed by Neal Gagner. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons on Defendant G1, #3 Summons on Defendant Bailey Jr., #4 Summons on Defendant Flowers, #5 Summons on Defendant Lee, #6 Summons on Defendant Muir, #7 Summons on Defendant Nicholson, #8 Summons on Defendant Secor, #9 Summons on Defendant Sharpless) (Blythin, John) Modified on 8/23/2024: Corrected party names and Jr. (lak)
August 23, 2024 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions, #Preliminary Injunction Procedure. (lak)
August 23, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gagner, Neal v. G1 Therapeutics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Gagner
Represented By: John D. Blythin
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn P. Muir
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacks Lee
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L. Flowers
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry A. Nicholson
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Bailey, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman E. Sharpless
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Secor
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G1 Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?