Houston, Kevon v. Captain Rahif et al
Plaintiff: Kevon E. Houston
Defendant: Security Director Giroux, Deputy Warden Thomas, John Doe AKA CO Mr. Fladhammer, Warden Cromwell and Captain Rahif
Case Number: 3:2024cv00884
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Anita Marie Boor
Referring Judge: William M Conley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2025 Filing 11 Notice RE Initial Partial Payment by Plaintiff Kevon E. Houston. (Attachments: #1 DOC Memo RE Filing Fee Disbursement, #2 Trust Account Statement (Sealed), #3 Envelope) (jls),(ps)
January 21, 2025 Filing 10 Warden PLRA Letter. (jls),(ps)
January 21, 2025 Partial Filing fee received: $27.19, receipt number 3962. (jls),(ps)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds. Initial partial filing fee due 2/6/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 1/15/2025. (jef),(ps)
January 6, 2025 Filing 8 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Kevon E. Houston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jls),(ps)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff Kevon Houston, whose recently filed complaint is awaiting screening pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C. 1915A, has filed a motion for appointment of counsel in this civil action. (Dkt. #4 .) There is no right to appointment of counsel in civil cases. A court may, in its discretion, recruit a lawyer who is willing to volunteer to represent an indigent civil litigant, but it need only do so where the legal and factual difficulties of the case exceed the litigant's ability to represent himself. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). Before making that determination, the court must first find that the litigant has made reasonable efforts to recruit an attorney on his own and has been unsuccessful. Jackson v. County of McLean, 953 F.2d 1070, 1072 (7th Cir. 1992). This court generally requires litigants in plaintiff's position to submit letters from at least three attorneys declining to represent them, or, if they received no response letters, a declaration attesting to whom they reached out for representation and when they sent the letter. Plaintiff has not met this threshold requirement. Therefore, plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (dkt. #4 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/3/2024. (jls),(ps)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Kevon E. Houston assessed an initial partial filing fee of $27.19 due 1/6/2025. Plaintiff's #5 motion to use release account funds to pay $27.19 initial partial payment is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 12/13/2024. (nln),(ps)
December 12, 2024 Filing 5 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Kevon E. Houston. (acd),(ps)
December 12, 2024 Filing 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Kevon E. Houston. (acd),(ps)
December 12, 2024 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Kevon E. Houston (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (acd),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2024: #2 IPP Calculation) (nln).
December 12, 2024 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevon E. Houston. (acd),(ps)
December 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevon E. Houston. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (acd),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston, Kevon v. Captain Rahif et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Director Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe AKA CO Mr. Fladhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Cromwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Rahif
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevon E. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?